Splunk board of directors
Web17 Nov 2024 · Data platform provider Splunk has announced that CEO Doug Merritt is stepping down after six years in the role, with Graham Smith, chair of the firm’s Board of Directors, appointed interim CEO. Web4 Mar 2024 · Splunk announced that Gary Steele has been appointed Chief Executive Officer of Splunk, and as a member of the company’s Board of Directors, effective April 11, 2024. Steele is a highly regarded ...
Splunk board of directors
Did you know?
WebAntonio Pietri is President and Chief Executive Officer (CEO) of AspenTech, and also serves on the company’s Board of Directors. Prior to his appointment to President and CEO, Pietri served as Executive Vice President, Worldwide Field Operations, where he led global Sales, Sales Operations, Professional Services, and Customer Support & Training. WebSplunk Appoints Richard P. Wallace and David Tunnell to Its Board of Directors SAN FRANCISCO, October 11, 2024 – Splunk Inc. (NASDAQ: SPLK), the data platform leader for security and observability, today announced that Richard P. Wallace and David Tunnell have been appointed to the Splunk Board of Directors, effective immediately.
WebManagement team Tom Eggemeier Interim CEO, Board Member Shanti Ariker General Counsel, Corporate Secretary & Chief Privacy Officer Colleen Berube Senior Vice President of Operations & Chief Information Officer Pat Copeland Chief Engineering Officer Norman Gennaro President of Worldwide Sales John Geschke Chief of Staff Adrian McDermott Web1 Dec 2024 · Splunk Board of Directors Appointments: Richard P. Wallace, President and CEO of KLA Corporation, and David Tunnell, Partner at Hellman & Friedman, were appointed to the Splunk Board of Directors. It was announced that Stephen G. Newberry will be stepping down from the Board, joining Sara Baack, as previously announced. ...
Web2 Mar 2024 · SAN FRANCISCO, March 2, 2024 – Splunk Inc. (NASDAQ: SPLK), the data platform leader for security and observability, today announced that Gary Steele has been … WebChandar earned a B.S. in mechanical engineering from PSG College of Technology and an M.S. in management information systems from the University of Texas. He is a Strategic Advisor to the CEO of Freshworks and is on the Board of Directors for BlueShift, an AI platform for customer engagement, and Donnelley Financial Solutions (NYSE:DFIN).
WebDirector Kevin has served as a member of our Board of Directors since October 2024. He is currently the Chairman and CEO of Tricentis, a company that provides software testing automation and software quality assurance products for enterprise software.
Web12 Oct 2024 · Splunk’s Board has undergone significant change to reflect the dynamic nature of its business and the technology industry. With the appointments of Messrs. … sowa market food trucksWebAmit Jain. Chief Product Officer, ServiceMax. Mike Jerich. Chief Revenue Officer, ServiceMax. Dave Kahley. Senior Vice President of Customer Solutions, ServiceMax. Megan Henf. Vice President of Business Strategy & Operations, ServiceMax. teaming broshure white oaksWeb22 Apr 2013 · SAN FRANCISCO - April 22, 2013 - Splunk Inc. (NASDAQ: SPLK), the leading software platform for real-time operational intelligence, today announced that Patricia B. … sowa machine toolWebChrysty leads legal, regulatory, public policy and communications, compliance, and security operations across Block. A longtime leader of Block’s legal team, she previously held positions at Electronic Arts Inc., served as a Deputy Attorney General at the California Department of Justice, and was an associate at Farella, Braun + Martel. sowa market boston hoursWebJin-Yong Cai. Partner at Global Infrastructure Partners. Jeffrey C. Campbell. Chief Financial Officer, American Express, Chair of the Audit Committee. Fulvio Conti. Chief Executive Officer and General Manager. (retired), Enel SpA, Chair of the Finance Committee. teaming callWeb2 Mar 2024 · Splunk Inc. (NASDAQ: SPLK), the data platform leader for security and observability, today announced that Gary Steele has been appointed Chief Executi Splunk … teaming cantilerosWebMar 2024 - Present3 years 2 months. Board Member & Chair of Estates & Digital Sub-Committee. Pro Bono position working on high performing leadership team for National Children's Charity. Focussed on the core activities of Governance, Strategy, Infrastructure and Risk, while simultaneously leading development of a digital strategy to improve the ... sowa marketing agency